skip to content

Grably, Melissa

CPSO#: 98919

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Glengarry Memorial Hospital
20260 County Road 43
Alexandria ON  K0C 1A0
Phone: (613) 525-2324
Fax: (613) 525-0159 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Melissa Grably Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Grably ( CPSO# 98919 )

Business Address:
20260 County Road 43
Alexandria ON  K0C 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 525-2324

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MELISSA GRABLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRABLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014