skip to content

Goyal, Kimmy

CPSO#: 94293

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Aug 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 22 Aug 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Windsor University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UNIT 1-5
10970 BRAMALEA RD
Brampton ON  L6R 3X1
Phone: 289-569-0124
Fax: 905-789-7372 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kimmy Goyal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Goyal ( CPSO# 94293 )

Business Address:
B C Urgent Care
10970 Bramalea Road
Brampton ON  L6R 3X1
Phone Number: (289) 569-0124

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012 Active
             Dr. Kimmy Goyal may practice medicine independently in Family Medicine, only.