skip to content

Govindarajulu, Arun Prasad

CPSO#: 85866

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Aug 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil, Telugu

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
McLaughlin 2 405
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 2002 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

PRINCES MARGARET HOSPITAL
DEPT OF ANESTHESIA
610 UNIVERSITY AVENUE
Toronto ON  M5T 2M9
Canada
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 4757
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

WOMENS COLLEGE HOSPITAL
76 Grenville St,
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6400 Ext. 6269
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto Lasik Centre
Suite#212, 2345, Yonge street
Toronto ON  M4P 2E5
Canada
Phone: (416) 733-2020
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A.P. Govindarajulu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Govindarajulu ( CPSO# 85866 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
McLaughlin 2-405
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5118

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Operating Room
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Operating Room
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 603-5118

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:18 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ARUN PRASAD GOVINDARAJULU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOVINDARAJULU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 09 Feb 2007
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 10 Feb 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2011