skip to content

Goulet, Marie-Helene

CPSO#: 90053

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jul 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 27 Mar 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: CSCE 738 Rue Notre-Dame Embrun, ON K0A 1W1
Date Received: 26 Jul 2018


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective:17 Nov 2012 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 2018