skip to content

Goulet, Kristian Bernard

CPSO#: 96561

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Sep 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1108 Klondike Road
Kanata ON  K2K 0G1
Phone: (613) 254-9777
Fax: (613) 254-9778 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brewer Park Assessment Clinic
Ottawa ON  K1S5T1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Kristian Bernard Goulet Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Goulet ( CPSO# 96561 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:13 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KRISTIAN BERNARD GOULET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOULET is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2013