skip to content

Gottlieb, Sidney Otto

CPSO#: 85625

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 May 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 May 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Emory University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
1 Huron Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1C3
Phone: (705) 444-1648
Fax: (705) 444-1909 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ontario Cardiology Services
6870 Goreway Drive
Unit 101
Malton ON  L4T 4J2
Canada
Phone: (905) 673-1756
Fax: (905) 673-1759
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

JeeJeebhoy Heart Clinic
164 Queen Street E.
Brampton ONL6V1B4
Brampton ON  L6W 3W8
Canada
Phone: (905) 451-0185
Fax: (905) 451-4743
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sidney Gottlieb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gottlieb ( CPSO# 85625 )

Business Address:
6870 Goreway Drive
Suite 101
Mississauga ON  L4V 1P1
Phone Number: (905) 673-1756

Business Address:
209 - 164 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6V 1B4
Phone Number: (905) 451-0185

Business Address:
Suite 201
1 Huron Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1C3
Phone Number: (705) 444-1648


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



US Virgin Islands
USA - California
USA - Florida
USA - Georgia
USA - Idaho
USA - Indiana
USA - Maryland
USA - Minnesota
USA - New Jersey
USA - New York
USA - North Carolina
USA - Oklahoma
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:21 May 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Cardiology Effective:21 May 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SIDNEY OTTO GOTTLIEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOTTLIEB is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Oct 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 2008