skip to content

Goswami, Rupashi

CPSO#: 90058

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Feb 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Feb 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Ross University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
130 HIGHWAY 20 EAST
UNIT A6
Fonthill ON  L0S 1E6
Phone: (905) 892-1010
Fax: (905) 892-4004 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R. Goswami Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Goswami ( CPSO# 90058 )

Business Address:
A6 - 130 Hwy 20 East
Fonthill ON  L0S 1E0
Phone Number: (905) 892-1010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RUPASHI GOSWAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOSWAMI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Dec 2008 to 23 Feb 2009
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 24 Feb 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2011