skip to content

Gorodzinsky, Fabian Pablo

CPSO#: 28902

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jan 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Spanish, Yiddish

Education:National Autonomous University of Mexico, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
610 Colborne Street
London ON  N6B 2V2
Phone: (519) 672-4051
Fax: (519) 672-4394 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Fabian Gorodzinsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Gorodzinsky ( CPSO# 28902 )

Business Address:
610 Colborne Street
London ON  N6B 2V2
Phone Number: (519) 672-4051

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:12 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FABIAN PABLO GORODZINSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORODZINSKY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Feb 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1980