skip to content

Gorman, Howard Edwin

CPSO#: 30500

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Nov 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Nov 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
315 Avenue Road
Suite 9
Toronto ON  M4V 2H2
Phone: (416) 651-1414 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Howard E. Gorman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 22 2019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:13 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HOWARD EDWIN GORMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 1978