skip to content

Gore, Stanley Larry

CPSO#: 26503

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Apr 2022
EXPIRY DATE
25 Apr 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 07 Mar 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: McMaster University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Apr 2022

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Jan 2005
Summary:

On January 19, 2005, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Gore to have committed acts of professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or acts relevant to the practice of medicine that would reasonably be regarded by members as being disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional in that he signed or co-signed prescriptions for individuals who are not his patient and prescibed to both people and animals without ever having seen or assessed the patient. Additionally, he received fees for each prescription co-signed, without advising the consumers of the fee, and to have failed to keep charts or records for the patients.

The penalty hearing took place on March 10, 2005. On March 10, 2005, the Discipline Committee accepted the joint submission on penalty proposed by counsel for the College and counsel for Dr. Gore and ordered that Dr. Gore appear before the panel to be reprimanded and that he pay $5,000 in costs to the College.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 2005-03-10
Hearing Date(s): Oct 04, 2004