Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Jan 2005
Summary:
On January 19, 2005, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Gore to have committed acts of professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or acts relevant to the practice of medicine that would reasonably be regarded by members as being disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional in that he signed or co-signed prescriptions for individuals who are not his patient and prescibed to both people and animals without ever having seen or assessed the patient. Additionally, he received fees for each prescription co-signed, without advising the consumers of the fee, and to have failed to keep charts or records for the patients.
The penalty hearing took place on March 10, 2005. On March 10, 2005, the Discipline Committee accepted the joint submission on penalty proposed by counsel for the College and counsel for Dr. Gore and ordered that Dr. Gore appear before the panel to be reprimanded and that he pay $5,000 in costs to the College.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 2005-03-10
Hearing Date(s): Oct 04, 2004