skip to content

Gordon, William Fleming

CPSO#: 22944

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2003
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2003

Summary

Date of Death: 3-Oct-2003

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1948

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003