skip to content

Gordon, Sherif Albert Abd El Sayed

CPSO#: 90358

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Feb 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Feb 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Glen Derry Professional
Walk-In Clinic
2760 Derry Road West
Mississauga ON  L5N 3N5
Phone: (289) 997-3220 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Gordon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gordon ( CPSO# 90358 )

Business Address:
Glen Derry Professional Walk-In Clinic
2760 Derry Road West
Suite 3
Mississauga ON  L5N 3N5
Phone Number: (289) 997-3220

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHERIF ALBERT ABD EL SAYED GORDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORDON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Apr 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2011