skip to content

Gordon, Margaret Leslie

CPSO#: 85287

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar
Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: 289-813-0211
Fax: 289-529-0251 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Margaret L. Gordon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gordon ( CPSO# 85287 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (289) 813-0211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARGARET LESLIE GORDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORDON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2011