skip to content

Gopidasan, Balaji

CPSO#: 97225

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jan 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 27 Jan 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chatham Kent Health Alliance
Mental Health and Addictions
240 Grand Ave.West
Chatham ON  N7L 1C1
Phone: (519) 351 6144 Ext. 5741
Fax: (519) 351 0450 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Medical Centre
430 The Board walk
Suite 308
waterloo N2T 0C1
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Canada
Phone: 519-744-1785
Fax: 226-887-8684
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

495 GRAND AV WEST
Chatham ON  N7L 1C5
Canada
Phone: 519-358-4123
Fax: 519-352-4152
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01

140 king street west
Chatham ON  N7M 1E3
Canada
Phone: 5194376329
Fax: 5193514882
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01

310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Canada
Phone: (519) 421-4233 Ext. 2299
Fax: (519) 533-6972
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

167 Rolph St
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Canada
Phone: 519 421 4233 Ext. 22 99
Fax: 519 - 533 - 69
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Balaji Gopidasan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Gopidasan ( CPSO# 97225 )

Business Address:
Medical Centre
430 Board Walk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 744-1785

Business Address:
Chatham Kent Health Alliance
Mental Health and Addictions
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 351-6144

Business Address:
495 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 1C5
Phone Number: (519) 352-0440


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jan 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 May 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Jul 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 29 May 2013 Active
 Dr.  Balaji  Gopidasan may practise medicine independently in psychiatry,
                  only.