skip to content

Goodwin, Susan Earleene

CPSO#: 32016

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Oct 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 08 Jun 2017
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Fawcett, Susan Earleene (used until: 03 Jun 2003 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare
West 5th Campus
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 35056
Fax: (905) 381-5670 Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 29 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 08 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 23 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 14 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 12 Aug 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 12 Aug 2019 Active
             As from August 12, 2019, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Susan Earleene
            Goodwin, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Goodwin to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                 DR.  SUSAN EARLEENE GOODWIN
                                          ("Dr. Goodwin")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010,
                  S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Goodwin, certificate of registration number 32016, am a member of
                  the College. 

            (3)   I, Dr. Goodwin, acknowledge that the College received information from
                  the NMS and conducted an investigation into whether I failed to maintain
                  the standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in my
                  prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics (the
                  "Investigation").  As a result of the Investigation, I underwent
                  remediation and submitted to a reassessment of my prescribing practices.
                  The reassessment report subsequently received by the College continued to
                  raise concerns about my standard of practice with respect to my
                  prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Goodwin, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.  

            (5)   Resignation of Prescribing Privileges

                  (a)   I, Dr. Goodwin, acknowledge that I have executed the Prescribing
                        Resignation Letter to Health Canada, which is attached hereto as
                        Schedule "A" (the "Resignation Letter").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Goodwin, consent to the College sending the Resignation
                        Letter to Health Canada on my behalf.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Goodwin, undertake that I will not issue new prescriptions
                        or renew existing prescriptions for or administer any of the
                        following substances as of September 1, 2019:
                  
                        (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                              under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
                              19);
                  
                        (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                  
                        (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
                              Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c.
                              F-27); 
                  
                        (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19); 
                  
                              (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                              Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached
                              hereto as Schedule "B"; and links to the current regulatory
                              lists are attached hereto as Schedule "C")
                  
                        (v)   Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and
                              Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, with a link to the
                              current regulatory list attached hereto as Schedule "D");
                  
                              and as amended from time to time.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Goodwin, undertake to immediately refer all patients to whom
                        I am prescribing any of the substances described in section (c),
                        above, to other physicians for assessment and care.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Goodwin, undertake to keep a log of all patients referred to
                        other physicians pursuant to section (5)(d), above (the "Log"). I,
                        Dr. Goodwin, undertake to include in the Log the name of each
                        patient referred, the name of the physician referred to, and the
                        date of referral. 
                  
            (6)   I, Dr. Goodwin, undertake that I will return any supplies of the
                  substances referred to in section (5)(c) above that are presently in my
                  possession, in any place, to a pharmacy in a safe and secure manner, as
                  stipulated in the College's Policy Number 8-12, "Prescribing Drugs."

            (7)   I, Dr. Goodwin, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                  location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited
                  to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health
                  Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively
                  my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of
                  executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform
                  the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of
                  commencing practice at that location.

            (8)   Posting a Sign 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Goodwin, undertake that as of September 1, 2019, I shall
                        post a sign in all waiting rooms and in each examination and
                        consulting room, in all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible
                        and secure location, in the form set out at Schedule "E."  For
                        further clarity, this sign shall state as follows: 
                  
                                          IMPORTANT NOTICE

                        Dr. Goodwin must not prescribe or administer any of the following: 
                  
                        -  Narcotic Drugs
                        -  Narcotic Preparations
                        -  Controlled Drugs
                        -  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                        -  Monitored Drugs
                  
                        Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and
                        Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Goodwin, undertake to post a certified translation in any
                        language in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        section (8)(a) above, in all waiting rooms and in each examination
                        and consulting room, in all my Practice Locations, in a clearly
                        visible and secure location, in the form set out at Schedule "E." 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Goodwin, undertake to provide the certified translation
                        described in section (8)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days
                        of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Goodwin, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of
                        this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language, I will
                        notify the College prior to providing any such services. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Goodwin, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation described in section (8)(c) prior to beginning to
                        provide services in any language described in section (8)(d).
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Goodwin, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Goodwin, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Goodwin, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Goodwin, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Goodwin, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (14)  I, Dr. Goodwin, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Goodwin, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Goodwin, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              The College received information from the Narcotics
                              Monitoring System about Dr. Goodwin's prescribing of
                              controlled substances, including narcotics.
                  
                              Based on the information received, the College conducted an
                              investigation into whether Dr. Goodwin failed to maintain the
                              standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent
                              in her prescribing of controlled substances, including
                              narcotics.  As a result of the investigation, Dr. Goodwin
                              underwent remediation and a reassessment.
                  
                              The reassessment report subsequently received by the College
                              continued to raise concerns aboutDr. Goodwin's standard of
                              practice with respect to her prescribing of controlled
                              substances, including narcotics.  As a result: 
                  
                              As of September 1, 2019, Dr. Goodwin must not issue new
                              prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for or
                              administer any of the following substances:
                  
                              (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                                    made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act,
                                    S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  
                              (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control
                                    Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and
                                    Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  
                              (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
                                    Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985,
                                    c. F-27); 
                  
                              (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                                    Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                    Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and
                                    Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
                  
                              (v)   Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety
                                    and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);    

                              and as amended from time to time.
                  
                              Dr. Goodwin must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting
                              rooms and each examination and consulting room, in all
                              Practice Locations, which states as follows: 
                  
                                                IMPORTANT NOTICE
                  
                                    Dr. Goodwin must not prescribe or administer any of the
                                    following: 
                  
                                    -  Narcotic Drugs
                                    -  Narcotic Preparations
                                    -  Controlled Drugs
                                    -  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                    -  Monitored Drugs
                  
                                    Further information may be found on the College of
                                    Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at
                                    www.cpso.on.ca
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Goodwin, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with,
                  unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by
                  the College and to any other activity the College deems necessary in
                  order to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Goodwin, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS, and any person who or institution
                  that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor
                  my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Goodwin, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS consent
                  forms, attached hereto as Schedule "F" and Schedule "G", respectively.

            (19)  I, Dr. Goodwin, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: August 12, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Susan Earleene Goodwin to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 12, 2019. See attached PDF:
Download Full Document (PDF)