skip to content

Goodman, Ella Maye

CPSO#: 91076

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Dec 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
NorWest Community Health Centres
525 Simpson Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 3J6
Phone: (807) 622-8235
Fax: (807) 622-3548 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ella Goodman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 14 2014

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:15 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELLA MAYE GOODMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 18 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2011