skip to content

Goodhall-Gunn, Patricia Olive

CPSO#: 19804

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1997
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: Gunn, Patricia Olive (used until: 14 Jul 1988 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Liverpool, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Sep 1991