skip to content

Goodall, John Christopher

CPSO#: 24160

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 10 Sep 2021
EXPIRY DATE
10 Sep 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Sep 1971

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jan 1975 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective:01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Sep 2021