skip to content

Goodacre, Robert Leslie

CPSO#: 29752

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1975 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 01 Jan 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2010