skip to content

Gonzalez-Almeyda, Roberto

CPSO#: 86416

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jan 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jan 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Superior Inst of Med Sciences of Havana, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
197 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N8
Phone: (519) 322-1300
Fax: (519) 322-1322 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Erie Shores health care
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Canada
Phone: (519) 326-2373
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. R. Gonzalez-Almeyda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gonzalez-Almeyda ( CPSO# 86416 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
197 Talbot West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N8
Phone Number: (519) 322-1300

Business Address:
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 326-2373

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERTO GONZALEZ-ALMEYDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GONZALEZ-ALMEYDA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jun 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2009