skip to content

Gonzalez Romulus, Marie-Christina

CPSO#: 92611

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queesnway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

16 Creekwood Cres
Nepean ON  K2H 1E2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Marie-Christina Gonzalez Romulus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gonzalez Romulus ( CPSO# 92611 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARIE-CHRISTINA GONZALEZ ROMULUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GONZALEZ ROMULUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 29 Mar 2010 to 11 Apr 2010
EL - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 13 Dec 2010 to 26 Dec 2010
EL - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2016