Gonzalez Martinez, Fernando (CPSO#: 99677)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Aug 2014

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National Autonomous Univ of Guadalajara, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9625 Yonge Street, Suite 1A
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 5T2
Phone: 905-237-4623
Fax: 905-237-5098
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Fernando Gonzalez Martinez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Gonzalez Martinez ( CPSO# 99677 )

Business Address:
9625 Yonge Street
Suite 1A
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 5T2
Phone Number: (905) 237-4623

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New Jersey
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Dec 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 19 Aug 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Aug 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Fernando Gonzalez Martinez may practise independently in physical medicine
            and rehabilitation, only.