skip to content

Gonzalez Lejarza, Rogelio Efrain

CPSO#: 85035

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National Autonomous Univ of Guadalajara, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Halton Mental Health Clinic
Department of Psychiatry
217 Main St East
Milton ON  L9E1N9
Phone: 905 6934240 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R. Gonzalez Lejarza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gonzalez Lejarza ( CPSO# 85035 )

Business Address:
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROGELIO EFRAIN GONZALEZ LEJARZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GONZALEZ LEJARZA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 12 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 13 Sep 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2014