skip to content

Gonsalves, Patrick Mark

CPSO#: 84732

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
345 Bloor St. East
Suite 4A
Toronto ON  M4W 3J6
Phone: 416-515-0590
Fax: 416-515-8853 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

3609 Sheppard Ave E.
Unit 202
Scarborough ON  M1T 3K8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Gonsalves and Best Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Best ( CPSO# 86753 )
Dr. P. Gonsalves ( CPSO# 84732 )

Business Address:
Suite 4A
345 Bloor Street East
Toronto ON  M4W 3J6
Phone Number: (416) 515-0590

Business Address:
202 - 3609 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1K 3T8

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PATRICK MARK GONSALVES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GONSALVES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008