skip to content

Gomez Vargas, Andrew

CPSO#: 86291

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Sep 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National University of Colombia, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
125 Welland Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2R 2N5
Phone: (905) 688-6289
Fax: (905) 688-0720 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

B01 - 132 Parkdale Ave S
Hamilton ON  L8K 3P3
Canada
Phone: 289 389 7973
Fax: 855 898 7988
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Andrew Gomez Vargas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gomez Vargas ( CPSO# 86291 )

Business Address:
132 Parkdale Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8K 3P3
Phone Number: (905) 312-4000

Business Address:
1193 Fischer-Hallman Road
Kitchener ON  N2R 1P4
Phone Number: (519) 593-1004

Business Address:
125 Welland Avenue South
St Catharines ON  L2R 2N5
Phone Number: (905) 688-6289

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW GOMEZ VARGAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOMEZ VARGAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 17 Sep 2007 to 07 Dec 2007
PEAP - CF - Neurology

McMaster University, 08 Dec 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
AVP - Neurology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 30 Apr 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 22 May 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2020

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: February 21, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: February 21, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)