skip to content

Gomez Jaramillo, David

CPSO#: 95829

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Dec 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Pontificia Universidad Javeriana, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond St, Donnelly Wing,
room 3-071
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 7143
Fax: (416) 864-5965 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ahmed Lawless de Rezende-Neto Gomez Jaramillo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. de Rezende-Neto ( CPSO# 99828 )
Dr. D. Gomez Jaramillo ( CPSO# 95829 )
Dr. N. Ahmed ( CPSO# 73094 )
Dr. B. Lawless ( CPSO# 68749 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
3-073 Donnelly Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5481

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID GOMEZ JARAMILLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOMEZ JARAMILLO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2017