skip to content

Gomes, Megan Melissa

CPSO#: 90945

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Nov 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Arnold Gomes, Megan Melissa (used until: 14 Mar 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
205-1355 Bank St
Ottawa, ON
K1H 8K7
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: 613-721-2907
Fax: 6135186555 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Riverside Hospital
1967 Riverside Drive Box 503
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
Phone: 613-798-5555
Fax: 613-739-6984
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Megan Gomes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gomes ( CPSO# 90945 )

Business Address:
205 - 1355 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Phone Number: (613) 721-2907

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MEGAN MELISSA GOMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOMES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 18 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 18 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 17 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 18 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2015 to 30 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2015