skip to content

Gomaa, Hala Gomaa Ahmed

CPSO#: 93410

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2020
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Jan 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cairo, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Egypt

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 02 Jan 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Dec 2019
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2020