skip to content

Golu, Tatiana

CPSO#: 84766

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Nov 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Victor Babes University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 837-6440
Fax: 519-837-6426 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Golu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Golu ( CPSO# 84766 )

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 837-6440

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TATIANA GOLU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 23 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2008