skip to content

Golombek, Harvey

CPSO#: 17961

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 11 Apr 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Apr 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: All requests for medical records should be forwarded to: [email protected]
Date Received: 12 Apr 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:16 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1960
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Apr 2019