Golian, Mehrdad (CPSO#: 94996)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Ottawa Heart Institute
Division of Cardiology
40 Rue Ruskin Street
Ottawa, ON. K1Y4W7
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (613) 696-7271
Fax: (613)696-7123
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 205 - 100 Pertosa Drive
Brampton ON  L6X 0H9
Canada
Phone: 905-796-7333
Fax: 905-796-7370
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mehrdad Golian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Kojori ( CPSO# 92274 )
Dr. M. Golian ( CPSO# 94996 )

Business Address:
University Ottawa Health Institute
Division of Cardiology
40 Rue Ruskin Street
Room H128SA
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 696-7271

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEHRDAD GOLIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 05 May 2011 to 01 Jun 2011
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 02 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2015