skip to content

Golev, Dmitry Sergeyevich

CPSO#: 86896

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Sep 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Tver State Medical Academy, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orillia Soldier Memorial Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
170 Colborne St W
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Dmitry Golev Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Golev ( CPSO# 86896 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital & Cancer Center
Hamilton Health Sciences
Radiology Department
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia
New Brunswick
Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:22 Jul 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DMITRY SERGEYEVICH GOLEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLEV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
AVP - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 23 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Jul 2013
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2012