skip to content

Golesic, Elizabeth Ann

CPSO#: 95322

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
202 - 765 Queen St E
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6A 2A8
Phone: (705) 450-7121
Fax: (866) 740-3789 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
Phone: 705-759-3434
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Elizabeth Golesic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Golesic ( CPSO# 95322 )

Business Address:
202 - 765 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2A8
Phone Number: (705) 450-7121

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANN GOLESIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLESIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016