skip to content

Goldsmith, William Oliver

CPSO#: 28439

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Dec 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Dec 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: William Goldsmith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 20 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Paitents seeking a copy of their medical record may contact Dr. Pooja Kaushik (110119) at: 1 - 33 Farely Dr Guelph ON N1L 0B7 or Tel: 519-837-8137
Date Received: 05 Dec 2018


Address: 1-33 Farley Dr Guelph ON N1L 0B7
Date Received: 04 Dec 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Dec 2018