skip to content

Goldman, Adam Zale

CPSO#: 96914

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Nov 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Durham Family Health Team
Building E, Suite 200B
1105 Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 1B5
Phone: (905) 420-9999
Fax: (905) 420-0863 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Appletree Medical Centre
Unit 15
1 Rossland Road West
Ajax ON  L1Z 1Z2
Canada
Phone: (905) 426-9880
Fax: (905) 426-3196
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Temmy Latner Centre for Palliative
Care
Mt. Sinai Hospital
60 Murray St - 4th Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Canada
Phone: 416-586-4800 Ext. 7884
Fax: 416-586-4804
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:30 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ADAM ZALE GOLDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 31 Oct 2011 to 22 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 23 Jan 2012 to 30 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 31 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2013