skip to content

Goldberg, Chaim Joseph

CPSO#: 29580

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Aug 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 1977
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Goldberg, Howard Jay (used until: 18 Jul 1989 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Yiddish

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2235 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1T 3G8
Phone: (416) 754-3937
Fax: (416) 754-1378 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Chaim Goldberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Goldberg ( CPSO# 29580 )

Business Address:
2235 Kennedy Road
2nd Floor
Scarborough ON  M1T 3G8
Phone Number: (416) 754-3937

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 18 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHAIM JOSEPH GOLDBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDBERG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1977

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 15, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective July 24, 2019, Dr. Goldberg has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)