skip to content

Goldberg, Benjamin

CPSO#: 17635

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Jul 1960

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yiddish

Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Medical record locations from: 
1) 1960 to 1985:
Child and Parent Resource Institute
600 Sanatorium Road
London, ON 
N6H 3W7
Tel: (519) 858-2774

2) 1985 to 2009 :
Command Records Management
100 Picadilly Street
London, ON
N6A 1R8
Tel: (519) 672-1460

3) 2009 to 2013:
Central West Specialized Developmental Services
51 Bond Street
Oakville, ON 
6K 1L8
(905) 844-7864

 OR

Regional Support Associates
333 Athlone Avenue
Woodstock, ON 
N4V 0B8
Tel: (519) 421-4219
Date Received: 20 Jun 2013


Instructions/Address:

Patients seeking medical records from Dr.’s private practice (closed on Jan 30/09) can locate them at: 

Command Services
100 Piccadilly Street
London, Ontario
N6A 1R8

Tel: 519-672-1460


Additionally, from Jan 30/09 to May 31/13 medical records may be obtained from: 

Regional Support Associates
333 Athlone Avenue
Woodstock, ON
N4V 0B8

Tel: 519-421-4248
Date Received: 24 Jan 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:15 Nov 1961 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013