skip to content

Golan, Eyal

CPSO#: 84989

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Toronto ON  L4C4Z3
Phone: (647) 401-4936 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Eyal Golan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 30 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:17 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EYAL GOLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2007