skip to content

Goffi, Alberto

CPSO#: 93101

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 May 2015
EXPIRY DATE
28 May 2022
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 29 May 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Turin, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Bond Wing 4-014
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 4168646060 Ext. 2474 Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Italy
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Critical Care Medicine Effective:29 May 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective:29 May 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 08 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 26 May 2015
CF - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 May 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 May 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jan 2019 Active
             1.    Dr. Alberto Goffi may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Critical Care, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
                        Goffi holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment. 
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Goffi  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Goffi's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Goffi's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on May 29, 2015. In accordance with paragraphs
                  2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration
                  Committee, automatically expire on May 28, 2022.