skip to content

Goela, Kapil

CPSO#: 98140

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 May 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Health
Emergency Department
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: 519-464-4400 Ext. 5214 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Fuller Goela Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Goela ( CPSO# 98140 )
Dr. E. Fuller ( CPSO# 98187 )

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
Emergency Department
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jul 2014 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 22 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAPIL GOELA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOELA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2015