skip to content

Goel, Sunita

CPSO#: 62559

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 1991

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Bhargava, Sunita (used until: 07 Jan 1993 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 4
4170 Fairview Street
Burlington ON  L7L 0G7
Phone: (905) 333-9799
Fax: (905) 333-4799 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sunita Goel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Goel ( CPSO# 62559 )

Business Address:
Suite 4
4170 Fairview Street
Burlington ON  L7L 0G7
Phone Number: (905) 333-9799

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUNITA GOEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1991