skip to content

Goel, Sadan Kumar

CPSO#: 23415

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Mar 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Vikram University, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 368 Wildwood Park Winnipeg MB R3T 0E7 Phone 204- 869-4448
Date Received: 01 Jun 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:10 Dec 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 6, 2012
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Please see attached undertaking effective March 6, 2012.
Download Full Document (PDF)