skip to content

Goekjian, Serge Raffi

CPSO#: 97775

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 408
379 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 0T1
Phone: (289) 597 6775
Fax: (289) 459 0221 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand Genesis Health
9080 Yonge Street
Level 2, Unit 12
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 6Z9
Canada
Phone: (289) 597-7676
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SERGE RAFFI GOEKJIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOEKJIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017