skip to content

Godfrey, Charles Morris

CPSO#: 14392

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Aug 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Aug 1953

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Charles Godfrey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 24 2020
Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS - Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St Regis Crescent S, North York, ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 1-866-356-3621
Date Received: 31 Aug 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:28 Nov 1958 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1953
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Aug 2020