skip to content

Goddard Hill, Alban Claude

CPSO#: 31429

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Aug 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Alban C. Goddard Hill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 22 2016

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Requests may be sent by email to [email protected]
Date Received: 29 Sep 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 2016