skip to content

Goad, Ralph Frederick

CPSO#: 29428

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jun 2021
EXPIRY DATE
10 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
672 Stewart Mountain Road
Victoria BC  V9B6J8
Phone: 2262292027

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ralph F. Goad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 2021