skip to content

Glover, Benedict Martin

CPSO#: 90173

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 16 Mar 2022
EXPIRY DATE
16 Mar 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Feb 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Queen's University Belfast School of Med, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Benedict Glover Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 24 2022

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Ireland

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.


Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  July 30, 2021
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On August 13, 2021, Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre notified the College, pursuant to s.33(b) of the Public Hospitals Act and s. 85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Benjamin Glover’s privileges had been restricted in that he agreed to a voluntary leave of absence, effective July 30, 2021. In addition, Dr. Glover has been suspended from his position at the University of Toronto.

These matters stem from allegations against Dr. Glover and are being investigated by Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre and the University of Toronto.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 09 Jan 2009 to 21 Mar 2009
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 22 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Dec 2010
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jan 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2019
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 29 Oct 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2022