skip to content

Gloster, Andrew Stuart

CPSO#: 88746

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Box 311
51 K Highway 105
Red Lake ON  P0V 2M0
Phone: (807) 727-3378
Fax: (807) 866-1639 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Andrew Gloster Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gloster ( CPSO# 88746 )

Business Address:
51 K Highway 105
Box 311
Red Lake ON  P0V 2M0
Phone Number: (807) 727-3378

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW STUART GLOSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLOSTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010