skip to content

Glikstein, Rafael Simon

CPSO#: 90838

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 722-7000 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rafael Glikstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Glikstein ( CPSO# 90838 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Argentina
Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:01 Jul 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 May 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2016 Active
             1.    Dr. Rafael Simon Glikstein may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Radiology,  University  of Ottawa, in which Dr. Glikstein holds and
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires when Dr. Glikstein
                  no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.